Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3182404

EP3182404 - STRINGED MUSICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
430-8650 Shizuoka Hamamatsu-shi / JP
[2017/25]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAYAMA, Daisuke
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
02 / MATSUDA, Hideto
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
03 / SHINODA, Ryo
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)Ettmayr, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2017/25]
Application number, filing date16197016.503.11.2016
[2017/25]
Priority number, dateJP2015022520817.11.2015         Original published format: JP 2015225208
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3182404
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:G10D3/02, G10D1/08
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/04]
Former [2017/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SAITENINSTRUMENT[2017/25]
English:STRINGED MUSICAL INSTRUMENT[2017/25]
French:INSTRUMENT DE MUSIQUE À CORDES[2017/25]
Examination procedure03.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/04]
19.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[IA]CA2792009  (LEE DONALD I [CA]) [I] 1 * abstract * * page 6, line 15 - line 25 * [A] 6;
 [XAI]US1241639  (LUIS HARRY G [US]) [X] 6 * abstract * * various braces secured to the back board are provided with the lateral extensions 22 at the end portions of said braces; page 2, line 103 - line 108 * [A] 1-5 [I] 7;
 [I]US4291606  (LEPAGE RAYMOND) [I] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]WO03054850  (MCPHERSON MATHEW A [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 8, line 6 - line 10 * * page 7, line 8 - line 26 *;
 [A]JP2008052054  (YAIRI GUITAR KK) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [AD]US4741238  (CARRIVEAU RONALD S [US]) [AD] 1,6 * abstract *
by applicantUS4741238
    - WOOD& STEEL, (2014), vol. 78, page 15