Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3168028

EP3168028 - INJECTION MOLDING INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-6025 / JP
[2017/20]
Inventor(s)01 / MORITA, Hiroshi
Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Chiba Works
731-1, Naganumahara-cho
Inage-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-0001 / JP
02 / ABE, Masahiro
Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Chiba Works
731-1, Naganumahara-cho
Inage-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-0001 / JP
03 / SHIBATA, Tatsuya
Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Chiba Works
731-1, Naganumahara-cho
Inage-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-0001 / JP
04 / HOTTA, Daigo
Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Chiba Works
731-1, Naganumahara-cho
Inage-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-0001 / JP
 [2017/20]
Representative(s)Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[2017/20]
Application number, filing date16197700.408.11.2016
[2017/20]
Priority number, dateJP2015022127011.11.2015         Original published format: JP 2015221270
[2017/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3168028
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/76
[2017/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPRITZGIESSINFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SPRITZGIESSMASCHINE[2017/20]
English:INJECTION MOLDING INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE[2017/20]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION ET MACHINE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION[2017/20]
Examination procedure08.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/20]
08.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2004080067  (YAMAZAKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9 * S13, S14 Fi. 2-3 and Fig. 3 * [Y] 4 [I] 5-7;
 [Y]DE102006033421  (MANNESMANN PLASTICS MACHINERY [DE]) [Y] 4 * par. 14 *
by applicantJPH09262889