blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3145252

EP3145252 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPTIMIZING POWER CONSUMPTION OF A TERMINAL IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.03.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2017/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Sang Bum
217-26, Bogwang-dong, Yongsan-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Soeng Hun
No.1208-1202, Shindong-ah Familie Apt.
Yeongdeok-dong, Giheung-gu
Gyeonggi-do
Yongin-si / KR
03 / Jeong, Kyeong In
No.102-511, Woncheon Seongil Apt.
Maetan 2-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Gyeonggi-do
Suwon-si / KR
04 / Jung, Jung Soo
No. 412-304, Neutimaeul Jugong 4-danji Apt.
Jeongja-dong, Bundang-gu
Gyeonggi-do
Seongnam-si / KR
05 / Cho, Joon Young
No. 224-101, Hwanggol Maeul 2-danji Apt.
Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Gyeonggi-do
Suwon-si / KR
06 / van Lieshout, Gert Jan
Communications House
South Street
Staines, Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB
07 / van der Velde, Himke
Communications House
South Street
Staines, Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB
08 / Ng, Boon Loong
3500 North Star Rd 311
Richardson, TX 75082 / US
 [2017/12]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2017/12]
Application number, filing date16197751.715.11.2011
[2017/12]
Priority number, dateUS20100413914P15.11.2010         Original published format: US 413914 P
US201161484645P10.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161484645 P
[2017/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3145252
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3145252
Date:20.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2017
ClassificationIPC:H04W52/02, H04W88/02, H04W76/28, // H04W72/04, H04W88/08, H04W36/14
[2020/12]
CPC:
H04W52/0229 (EP,US); H04W52/0212 (KR,US); H04W52/0209 (US);
H04W36/14 (EP,KR,US); H04W52/0203 (US); H04W52/0216 (KR,US);
H04W52/0235 (EP,US); H04W52/0258 (EP,US); H04W72/0473 (US);
H04W72/20 (US); H04W76/28 (EP,KR,US); H04W88/02 (KR,US);
H04W88/08 (US); Y02D30/70 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/12]H04W52/02, H04W88/02, H04W76/04, // H04W72/04, H04W88/08, H04W36/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/12]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES STROMVERBRAUCHS EINES ENDGERÄTES IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2017/12]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPTIMIZING POWER CONSUMPTION OF A TERMINAL IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2017/12]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À OPTIMISER LA CONSOMMATION ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN TERMINAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2017/12]
Examination procedure08.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/12]
08.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
10.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
05.02.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2020Fee for grant paid
14.04.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.04.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11841915.9  / EP2642799
Opposition(s)23.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
20.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
23.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.11.2011
AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CY20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
MK20.05.2020
MT20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
TR20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
IE15.11.2020
LU15.11.2020
BE30.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/32]HU15.11.2011
AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CY20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
MK20.05.2020
MT20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
TR20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
IE15.11.2020
LU15.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2022/27]HU15.11.2011
AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CY20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
MT20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
TR20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
IE15.11.2020
LU15.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/46]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
IE15.11.2020
LU15.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/37]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
LU15.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/33]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
LU15.11.2020
Former [2021/31]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
NO20.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT20.05.2020
NO20.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS20.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010110897  (CHUN SUNG DUCK [KR], et al) [I] 1-14 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0024] ** paragraph [0064] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.