Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3226187

EP3226187 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INFORMATION PRESENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.10.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd.
Room 01, Floor 9
Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of
China Resources
No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Qian
Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co. Ltd.
Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II
of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street
Haidian District
Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Kudlek, Franz Thomas
Dehns Germany
Theresienstraße 6-8
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/40]Kudlek, Franz Thomas
Dehns Germany LLP
Singlspielerhaus
Sendlinger Straße 29
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16198785.415.11.2016
[2017/40]
Priority number, dateCN2016118893829.03.2016         Original published format: CN201610188938
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3226187
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/48]
Former [2017/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INFORMATIONSPRÄSENTATION[2017/40]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INFORMATION PRESENTATION[2017/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRÉSENTATION D'INFORMATIONS[2017/40]
Examination procedure15.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2017Examination requested  [2017/48]
30.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/20]
Documents cited:Search[X]CN105117897  (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - Anonymous, "How to display notifications on Xiaomi phone's lock screen ?", (20140728), URL: http://webcazine.com/12040/how-to-display-notifications-on-xiaomi-phones-lock-screen-2/, (20170324), XP055358773 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *