Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3168126

EP3168126 - INVERTED T-SHAPED WING SUITABLE FOR BEING INSTALLED ON A BOAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
XAP
ZAC Le Vigne
298, Rue des Entrepreneurs
30420 Calvisson / FR
[2017/20]
Inventor(s)01 / HARDY, François
XAP
14, Rue du Pont
30820 CAVEIRAC / FR
02 / THERY, Pierre
XAP
Côté Parc
Impasse du Parc
30620 UCHAUD / FR
 [2017/20]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2017/20]
Application number, filing date16198824.115.11.2016
[2017/20]
Priority number, dateFR2015006095116.11.2015         Original published format: FR 1560951
[2017/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3168126
Date:17.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3168126
Date:09.05.2018
Language:FR
[2018/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:B63B1/28
[2017/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/52]
Former [2017/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TRAGFLÜGEL IN FORM EINES UMGEDREHTEN T, DER ANGEPASST IST, UM AUF EINEM BOOT INSTALLIERT ZU WERDEN[2017/20]
English:INVERTED T-SHAPED WING SUITABLE FOR BEING INSTALLED ON A BOAT[2017/20]
French:AILE PORTANTE EN FORME DE T INVERSÉ ADAPTÉE POUR ÊTRE INSTALLÉE SUR UN BATEAU[2017/20]
Examination procedure15.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.11.2017Examination requested  [2017/52]
18.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.03.2018Fee for grant paid
23.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL09.05.2018
AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
IE15.11.2018
LU15.11.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/48]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
IE15.11.2018
LU15.11.2018
Former [2019/34]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
LU15.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/09]EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2862602  (ALDIN GERARD ROGER [FR]; ALDIN ALINE MARIE ANDREE [FR]) [A] 1,16 * figures 1,24,25 *
 [A]JPH07205891  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,16 * figure - *
 FR1373041  [ ]
 FR2587967  [ ]
 FR2862602  [ ]