Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3171197

EP3171197 - SENSOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAUMER ELECTRIC AG
Hummelstrasse 17
8500 Frauenfeld / CH
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Schwendimann, Herr Mathias
Bahnsteigstrasse 9
8212 Neuhausen / CH
02 / Kunz, Valentin
Ida-Sträuli-Strasse 91
8404 Winterthur / CH
 [2017/21]
Representative(s)Strauss, Steffen
Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 Group Intellectual Property
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2017/21]
Application number, filing date16199664.018.11.2016
[2017/21]
Priority number, dateDE2015101503423.11.2015         Original published format: DE102015015034
[2017/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3171197
Date:24.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3171197
Date:02.08.2017
Language:DE
[2017/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/03, H01Q1/32, H01Q19/06, // G01S7/02
[2017/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/11]
Former [2017/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENSORANORDNUNG[2017/21]
English:SENSOR ASSEMBLY[2017/21]
French:SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION[2017/21]
Examination procedure18.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE19621075  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,11 [I] 11;
 [XYI]DE19703095  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,5-8 * column 1, lines 3-6 * * column 2, lines 3-51 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 13; figure 1a * * column 3, lines 58-68; figure 3 * [Y] 11 [I] 11;
 [XY]DE19710811  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 1, lines 5-16; figure 3 * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 40 * * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 * [Y] 2;
 [A]DE19961387  (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [YD]DE102012202913  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 2,11 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE202010011734U  (ZWEIBRUEDER OPTOELECTRONICS [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0019] - [0020]; figures 1a,1b *;
 [Y]US2005007777  (KLIPSTEIN DONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0083] , [ 0092]; figure 5 *;
 [Y]DE102012111183  (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0029] - [0030] - [ 0034] - [0035] - [ 0037] - [0039]; figure 7 *;
 [Y]WO0125818  (AGILIS COMM TECH PTE LTD [SG], et al) [Y] 2 * page 3, lines 2-14 * * page 5, lines 3-6 * * page 7, lines 5-15; figures 1,5 *
 [XY]  - BOSCH, "Adaptive Fahrgeschwindigskeitsregelung ACC", BOSCH KRAFTFAHRZEUGTECHNICK - TECHNISCHE UNTERRICHTUNG,, (20020401), page 81pp, XP007907314 [X] 1,7,8 * page 15; figure 2 * [Y] 2
by applicantDE102012202913