Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3181014

EP3181014 - CRADLE THAT CAN BE PLACED ALONGSIDE A BED FOR ADULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BREVI MILANO S.P.A.
Via Lombardia, 15/17
24060 Telgate / IT
[2018/38]
Former [2017/25]For all designated states
BREVI S.R.L.
Via Lombardia, 15/17
24060 Telgate (BG) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / BREVI, Mauro
Via Quintino Alto, 25
24123 Bergamo / IT
02 / PIATTICA, Paolo
Via Pascolo 2/A
24044 Dalmine (BG) / IT
 [2018/39]
Former [2017/42]01 / BREVI, Mauro
Via Quintino Alto, 25
24123 Bergamo / IT
02 / PIATTICA, Paolo
Via Pascolo 2/A
24044 Dalmine BG / IT
Former [2017/25]01 / BREVI, Mauro
Via Quintino Alto, 25
24123 Bergamo / IT
02 / PIATTICA, Paolo
Via Piattica, 2A
24044 Dalmine BG / IT
Representative(s)Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L.
Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2°
08036 Barcelona / ES
[2018/39]
Former [2017/25]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date16199795.221.11.2016
[2017/25]
Priority number, dateIT2015UB0575820.11.2015         Original published format: IT UB20155758
[2017/25]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3181014
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3181014
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47D7/01, A47D9/00, A47D9/04
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
Former [2017/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:WIEGE, DIE ENTLANG EINES BETTS FÜR ERWACHSENE PLATZIERT WERDEN KANN[2017/25]
English:CRADLE THAT CAN BE PLACED ALONGSIDE A BED FOR ADULTS[2017/25]
French:BERCEAU QUI PEUT ÊTRE PLACÉ LE LONG D'UN LIT D'ADULTES[2018/19]
Former [2017/25]BERCEAU QUI PEUT ÊTRE PLACÉ LE LONG DUN LIT D'ADULTES
Examination procedure21.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
21.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2018Fee for grant paid
10.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)27.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SI26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
IE21.11.2018
LU21.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
IE21.11.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/33]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL26.09.2018
AT26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
NO26.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT26.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]CN204351446U  (ZHONGSHAN WEST DISTR QINGYUAN TRADE AGENT SERVICE DEPT) [X] 1,6 * figures 1,10,12 * [A] 5 [Y] 3,4,8 [I] 2,7
 [Y]US2005241064  (LOPES PAULA [US] ET AL) [Y] 3,4,8 * figures 1a,5c * * paragraphs [0009] , [0060] *
 [A]US2003177574  (WALDMAN KENNETH [US]) [A] 3,4,8 * figures 1a,1b,1e *
 [A]CN2623109Y  (ZHENG QINMING [CN]) [A] 3,4,8 * figures 4a,4b *