blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3327612


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.04.2019 Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
07.12.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
07.12.2018 Request for examination filed published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
07.12.2018 Change - designated states published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
05.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.04.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
24.01.2018 Amendment by applicant
25.11.2016 Change - representative