Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3327612

EP3327612 - FINGERPRINT SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2018/22]
Inventor(s)01 / SUWALD, Thomas
c/o NXP B.V., Intellectual Property Group
High Tech Campus 60
Eindhoven
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
 [2018/22]
Representative(s)Krott, Michel
NXP Semiconductors
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2018/22]
Application number, filing date16200439.424.11.2016
[2018/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3327612
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2018/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/02]
Former [2018/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FINGERABDRUCKERFASSUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2018/22]
English:FINGERPRINT SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2018/22]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'EMPREINTES[2018/22]
Examination procedure19.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/02]
30.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9941696  (FINGERPRINT CARDS AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12,15 * page 3, line 23 - line 30 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 9 * * page 16, line 9 - line 12 * * page 17, line 29 - page 18, line 27 * * abstract * [I] 13,14;
 [I]US2005139685  (KOZLAY DOUGLAS [US]) [I] 14 * abstract *;
 [IAY]US2016239700  (YANG CHAO-CHI [TW], et al) [I] 4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * [A] 7-10 [Y] 6;
 [Y]WO9852147  (HARRIS CORP [US]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 5 *;
 [X]US2013181949  (SETLAK DALE R [US]) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2008309800  (OLSEN ALF [NO], et al) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *