Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3173570

EP3173570 - COFFERDAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Collados, Jose
2 Rue Nerva
30000 Nimes / FR
For all designated states
SAS Collad'eau CSPP
866 Avenue du Marechal Juin
30900 Nimes / FR
[2017/22]
Inventor(s)01 / COLLADOS, José
30
2 Rue Nerva
30000 NIMES / FR
 [2017/22]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2017/22]
Application number, filing date16200984.928.11.2016
[2017/22]
Priority number, dateFR2015006146427.11.2015         Original published format: FR 1561464
[2017/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3173570
Date:31.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/22]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP3173570
Date:12.07.2017
[2017/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/00
[2017/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/52]
Former [2017/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHUTZDAMM[2017/22]
English:COFFERDAM[2017/22]
French:BATARDEAU[2017/22]
Examination procedure28.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2017Examination requested  [2017/52]
11.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/35]
04.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2607601  (MCGLADE PATRICK [IE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026]; figure - * [I] 5,10;
 [Y]US5943832  (RUSSELL JAMES E [CA]) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 56; figure - *;
 [Y]US2003102637  (HAMEL WILLY [BE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0062]; figures 6-8 *