Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3196885 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3196885



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 295
08.04.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.02.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.02.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
11.02.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
11.02.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
19.10.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.10.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.10.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.10.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
01.10.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.01.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
26.01.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
26.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
26.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
26.01.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
26.01.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
26.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.01.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
31.07.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.06.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.06.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 8
22.06.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
22.06.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
15.06.2017 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
01.02.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 101
30.11.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.11.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
30.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 7
30.11.2016 Description Search / examination 16
30.11.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2016 Drawings Search / examination 12
30.11.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4