Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3170515

EP3170515 - ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE ARTICLES AND METHODS OF FORMING ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer GmbH
Sulzer Allee 8
8404 Winterthur / CH
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / ABT, Niels A.
Wurmbühlstrasse 24
8405 Winterthur / CH
02 / SCHNEIDER-STORRER, Werner
Landstrasse 78d
8197 Rafz / CH
 [2017/21]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/21]Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date16203066.218.08.2005
[2017/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3170515
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/16, C08L23/06, A61K31/355, A61L27/44, A61L27/50
[2017/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/01]
Former [2017/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:POLYETHYLENARTIKEL MIT ULTRAHOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHYLENARTIKELN[2017/21]
English:ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE ARTICLES AND METHODS OF FORMING ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE ARTICLES[2017/21]
French:ARTICLES DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE À POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE TRÈS ÉLEVÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION D'ARTICLES DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE À POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE TRÈS ÉLEVÉ[2017/21]
Examination procedure09.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
12.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05777319.4  / EP1924299
EP09013154.1  / EP2172229
EP14173530.8  / EP2792373
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
07.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2004064618  (MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL; MURATOGLU, ORHUN, K; SPIEGELBERG, STEP) [X] 1-14 * example 4 * [Y] 15;
 [XY]  - PARTH M ET AL, "STUDIES ON THE EFFECT OF ELECTRON BEAM RADIATION ON THE MOLECULAR STRUCTURE OF ULTRA-HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF ALPHA-TOCOPHEROL WITH RESPECT TO ITS APPLICATION IN MEDICAL IMPLANTS", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE. MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, CHAPMAN AND HALL, LONDON, GB, (2002), vol. 13, no. 10, ISSN 0957-4530, pages 917 - 931, XP008053056 [X] 1-13 * page 918, column 1 * [Y] 14,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1019892004830
 [XY]  - TOMITA N ET AL, "PREVENTION OF FATIGUE CRACKS IN ULTRAHIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE JOINT COMPONENTS BY THE ADDITION OF VITAMIN E", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, WILEY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1999), vol. 48, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 474 - 478, XP000943164 [X] 1-14 * page 475, column 1 * * page 477, column 2 * [Y] 15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4636(1999)48:4<474::AID-JBM11>3.0.CO;2-T
 [XY]  - SHIBATA N ET AL, "The anti-oxidative properties of alpha-tocopherol in gamma-irradiated UHMWPE with respect to fatigue and oxidation resistance", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20050419), vol. 26, no. 29, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 5755 - 5762, XP004931609 [X] 1-13 * page 5756, column 2 * [Y] 14,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2005.02.035
by applicantWO2004101009
 US2004156879
    - PARTH ET AL., "Studies on the effect of electron beam radiation on the molecular structure of ultra-high molecular weight polyethylene under the influence of a-tocopherol with respect to its application in medical implants", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 13, pages 917 - 921
    - MURATOGLU ET AL., "J Biomed Mater Res", IDENTIFICATION AND QUANTIFICATION OF IRRADIATION IN UHMWPE THROUGH TRANS-VINYLENE YIELD, (20010915), vol. 56, no. 4