Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3181234

EP3181234 - SPRAY HEAD WITH HYPERBOLOID SPRAY PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kohler Co.
444 Highland Drive
Kohler, WI 53044 / US
[2017/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Mazz, Margaret C.
2524 Lakeshore Drive
Sheboygan, WI 53081 / US
02 / Rexach, Rafael A.
1699 Maple Lane
Sheboygan, WI 53081 / US
 [2018/47]
Former [2017/25]01 / Mazz, Margaret C.
2524 Lakeshore Drive
Sheboygan, WI Wisconsin 53081 / US
02 / Rexach, Rafael A.
1699 Maple Lane
Sheboygan, WI Wisconsin 53081 / US
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2018/47]
Former [2017/25]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date16203658.613.12.2016
[2017/25]
Priority number, dateUS201562268211P16.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562268211 P
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3181234
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3181234
Date:21.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:B05B1/06, B05B1/18
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/04]
Former [2017/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SPRÜHKOPF MIT HYPERBOLOID-SPRÜHMUSTER[2017/25]
English:SPRAY HEAD WITH HYPERBOLOID SPRAY PATTERN[2017/25]
French:TÊTE DE PULVÉRISATION À MOTIF DE PULVÉRISATION HYPERBOLOÏDE[2017/25]
Examination procedure13.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/04]
04.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2018Fee for grant paid
28.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)22.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
MC21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SI21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
IE13.12.2018
LU13.12.2018
MT13.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
[2020/08]
Former [2019/50]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
MC21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SI21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
IE13.12.2018
LU13.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/48]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
MC21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
IE13.12.2018
LU13.12.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
MC21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
LU13.12.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/39]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
LU13.12.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2013141719  (METHVEN LTD [NZ]) [X] 1,3,4,15 * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 7; figures 8a,8b * [I] 14;
 [XI]US5297739  (ALLEN DONOVAN J [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 11, line 55 - column 12, line 15; figures 7,8 * [I] 14,15;
 [X]US2006144968  (LEV MORDECHAI [US]) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0070]; figures 14-19 *;
 [XI]FR2454837  (LABOMEKA ANSTALT [LI]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 4, line 30 - page 6, line 14; figure 4 * [I] 5;
 [X]US2005273945  (ZACCONE MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0052]; figure - *;
 [XP]WO2016091398  (HUSQVARNA AB [SE]) [XP] 1,5 * page 17, line 32 - page 18, line 9; figures 11,13 *;
 [A]EP2620224  (KOHLER CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0078]; figure - *;
 [A]JPH0291654U  (KOJI NAKANO) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]US2007246577  (LEBER LELAND C [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0057]; figure - *;
 [A]DE202015007728U  (GERALD SEBERT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0078]; figure - *;
 [L]CN205949103U  (RUNNER (XIAMEN) IND CORP) [L] 1 * figure - *