blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3182114

EP3182114 - PARTIAL DISCHARGE MONITORING OF ELECTRICAL MACHINES USING ACOUSTIC EMISSION SENSORS AND ELECTRICAL SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2020/22]
Former [2017/25]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEHGHAN NIRI, Ehsan
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY New York 12345 / US
02 / ROSE, Curtis Wayne
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY New York 12345 / US
03 / WITNEY, Andrew Batton
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY New York 12345 / US
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2020/22]
Former [2017/25]Pöpper, Evamaria
General Electric Technology GmbH
GE Corporate Intellectual Property
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date16203940.814.12.2016
[2017/25]
Priority number, dateUS20151496989315.12.2015         Original published format: US201514969893
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3182114
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3182114
Date:27.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2017
ClassificationIPC:G01N27/92, G01N29/14, G01N29/24, G01N29/44, G01R31/12
[2017/25]
CPC:
G01N29/14 (EP,US); G01R31/343 (EP,CN,US); G01N27/92 (EP,US);
G01N29/2418 (EP,US); G01N29/4445 (EP,US); G01N29/4481 (EP,US);
G01R31/1209 (EP,CN,US); G01R31/1227 (US); G06N20/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06N5/047 (US); G01N2291/0258 (EP,US); G01N2291/0289 (US);
G01N2291/2638 (US); G01R31/1272 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/06]
Former [2017/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TEILENTLADUNGSÜBERWACHUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINEN MITTELS SCHALLEMISSIONS- UND ELEKTRISCHER SENSOREN[2017/25]
English:PARTIAL DISCHARGE MONITORING OF ELECTRICAL MACHINES USING ACOUSTIC EMISSION SENSORS AND ELECTRICAL SENSORS[2017/25]
French:SURVEILLANCE DE DÉCHARGE PARTIELLE DES MACHINES ÉLECTRIQUES PAR MOYEN DE CAPTEURS D'ÉMISSION ACOUSTIQUE ET DE CAPTEURS ÉLECTRIQUES[2017/25]
Examination procedure14.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/06]
29.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2020Fee for grant paid
17.04.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.04.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.03.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.12.2016
AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
MK27.05.2020
MT27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
TR27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB14.12.2020
IE14.12.2020
LU14.12.2020
BE31.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/32]HU14.12.2016
AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
MK27.05.2020
MT27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
TR27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB14.12.2020
IE14.12.2020
LU14.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
Former [2022/27]HU14.12.2016
AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
MT27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
TR27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB14.12.2020
IE14.12.2020
LU14.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
Former [2022/10]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB14.12.2020
IE14.12.2020
LU14.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
Former [2021/52]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB14.12.2020
IE14.12.2020
LU14.12.2020
CH31.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
LI31.12.2020
Former [2021/49]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
GB14.12.2020
IE14.12.2020
LU14.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
Former [2021/48]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
IE14.12.2020
LU14.12.2020
FR31.12.2020
Former [2021/46]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
IE14.12.2020
LU14.12.2020
Former [2021/40]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS27.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - KYU-BOCK CHO ET AL, "Recent progress and future perspectives on condition monitoring and diagnostics for power equipment in Korea", CONDITION MONITORING AND DIAGNOSIS, 2008. CMD 2008. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080421), ISBN 978-1-4244-1621-9, pages 19 - 31, XP031292700 [X] 1,9 * figures 6,7,16; tables I,II * * page 2, column l, paragraph 3 - page 8, column r, paragraph 3 * [I] 2-8,10
 [X]  - MARKALOUS S ET AL, "Detection and location of partial discharges in power transformers using acoustic and electromagnetic signals", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON DIELECTRICS AND ELECTRICAL INSULATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20081201), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TDEI.2008.4712660, ISSN 1070-9878, pages 1576 - 1583, XP011239907 [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 1576, column r, paragraph l - page 1582, column r, paragraph l; figures 2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TDEI.2008.4712660
 [XI]  - WU MIN ET AL, "An overview of state-of-the-art partial discharge analysis techniques for condition monitoring", IEEE ELECTRICAL INSULATION MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 31, no. 6, doi:10.1109/MEI.2015.7303259, ISSN 0883-7554, (20151101), pages 22 - 35, (20151021), XP011588433 [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 23, column l, paragraph 2 - page 32, column r, paragraph 1 * [I] 2-8,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEI.2015.7303259
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.