Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3330968 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3330968



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 220
21.10.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.09.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.08.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
29.08.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
29.08.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
29.05.2019 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
09.05.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.05.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.05.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.05.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
09.05.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 31
11.04.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
04.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
04.12.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
04.12.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
04.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.06.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.05.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.07.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.07.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 5
26.07.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
26.07.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
17.07.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 53
14.12.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.12.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 7
14.12.2016 Description Search / examination 16
14.12.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.2016 Drawings Search / examination 9
14.12.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4