Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3216741

EP3216741 - CRANE COMPRISING AN EXTENDING BOOM AND A DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE EXTENSION OF SAID EXTENDING BOOM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FASSI GRU S.p.A.
Via Roma, 110
24021 Albino, BG / IT
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CERESOLI, Rossano
Via Orti, 2
24020 Ranica / IT
02 / SIGNORI, Roberto
Via Concezione, 17
24021 Albino / IT
03 / BIROLINI, Valentino
Via Case Sparse, 9
24020 Cene / IT
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[2019/15]
Former [2017/37]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date16205736.821.12.2016
[2017/37]
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0144908.03.2016         Original published format: IT UA20161449
[2017/37]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3216741
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3216741
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:B66C13/12, B66C13/46, B66C23/70
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/11]
Former [2017/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KRAN MIT EINEM AUSZIEHBAREN AUSLEGER, UND GERÄT ZUR MESSUNG DER VERLÄNGERUNG DES BESAGTEN AUSZIEHBAREN AUSLEGERS[2017/37]
English:CRANE COMPRISING AN EXTENDING BOOM AND A DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE EXTENSION OF SAID EXTENDING BOOM[2017/37]
French:GRUE COMPRENANT UNE FLÈCHE EXTENSIBLE, ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE L'EXTENSION DE LADITE FLÈCHE EXTENSIBLE[2017/37]
Examination procedure21.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/11]
02.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2019Fee for grant paid
27.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2520530  (B O B SISTEMI IDRAULICI S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [A]US2014251726  (DITTY MACKENZIE M [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 5-11, 12A, 12B * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0049] * * The lines 71 are managed by an articulated power track, shown as carrier 70, that supports and routes the lines 71 through the boom 16. The carrier 70 is supported within the boom 16 with a channel, shown as member 74. *;
 [A]WO2015022405  (HIRSCHMANN AUTOM & CONTROL [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [A]US5877693  (EYLER FRANCIS R [US]) [A] 1 * see the references: 24, 50, 22... on the figures *;
 [A]CN201165454Y  (XUZHOU HEAVY MACHINERY CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1 * see the length sensors 1 & 2 on figure 1 *;
 [A]US3922789  (SARRELL IVAN D) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1, 2A, 2B, 3, 6 *;
 [A]WO9206349  (DOTRONIC MIKROPROZESSORTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - * * claims 1-4 * * Zur Messung und Auswertung der Reflektionszeit dieses Spannungssprunges auf den Leitern 6 ist eine Messeinrichtung, allgemein mit 10 bezeichnet, vorgesehen und zur Darstellung der ... Teleskopierlänge ein Anzeigegerät, allgemein mit 11 bezeichnet. *