Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3181161

EP3181161 - REDUCED-PRESSURE, COMPRESSION SYSTEMS AND APPARATUSES FOR USE ON A CURVED BODY PART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/25]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WILKES, Robert Peyton
13538 Cresent Creek
San Antonio, TX 78231 / US
02 / LONG, Justin Alexander
6335 Mustang Point Dr.
San Antonio, TX 78240 / US
03 / KAZALA, Richard Marvin
16331 Persimmon Well
San Antonio, TX 78247 / US
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/25]Cordina, Kevin John
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Application number, filing date16206186.529.05.2009
[2017/25]
Priority number, dateUS2008005780730.05.2008         Original published format: US 57807
US2008005780330.05.2008         Original published format: US 57803
US2008005780030.05.2008         Original published format: US 57800
US2008005779730.05.2008         Original published format: US 57797
US2008005780830.05.2008         Original published format: US 57808
US2008005780230.05.2008         Original published format: US 57802
US2008005780530.05.2008         Original published format: US 57805
US2008005781030.05.2008         Original published format: US 57810
US2008005779830.05.2008         Original published format: US 57798
US2008012136210.12.2008         Original published format: US 121362
US2009014406712.01.2009         Original published format: US 144067
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3181161
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00, A61F13/02, A61F13/00, A61L15/60
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/05]
Former [2017/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:KOMPRESSIONSSYSTEME UND -VORRICHTUNGEN MIT REDUZIERTEM DRUCK ZUR VERWENDUNG AUF EINEM GEKRÜMMTEN KÖRPERTEIL[2017/25]
English:REDUCED-PRESSURE, COMPRESSION SYSTEMS AND APPARATUSES FOR USE ON A CURVED BODY PART[2017/25]
French:SYSTÈMES DE COMPRESSION À PRESSION RÉDUITE ET APPAREILS POUR UNE UTILISATION SUR UN PARTIE COURBE DU CORPS[2017/25]
Examination procedure22.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/05]
14.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09770665.9  / EP2279018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6071267  (ZAMIEROWSKI DAVID S [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8,11-13 * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 25 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4,9,14,15;
 [XI]WO2008063281  (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,11-13 * page 10, lines 3-13 * * page 13, line 32 - page 14, line 14 * * figure 2 * [I] 3,4,9,14,15;
 [XI]US2001043943  (COFFEY ARTHUR C [US]) [X] 1,2,8,11-13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0035] - [0038] * [I] 3,4,9,14,15;
 [XI]US2007027414  (HOFFMAN BRIAN D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,11-13 * figures 3,1 * * paragraphs [0049] , [0056] - [0063] * [I] 3,4,9,14,15;
 [A]WO2006012745  (ROSS BRADLEY ALLAN [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 1 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]US3026874  (STEVENS ROBERT C) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *