Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3169042

EP3169042 - CONTENTS SUPPLY SERVICE SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/20]A CONTENTS SUPPLY SYSTEM, A METHOD, A SERVICE SERVER, A STORAGE MEANS, A RELAY METHOD, AN APPLICATION SERVER AND A CELLULAR PHONE FOR MULTI CONNECTED END TERMINAL
[2018/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SK Planet Co., Ltd.
11, Euljiro, 2-ga
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-999 / KR
[2019/16]
Former [2017/20]For all designated states
SK Planet Co., Ltd.
11, Euljiro, 2-ga
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-999 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Jeong Hoon
102-1503 Nokwon Hanshin Apt.
Jamwon-dong
Seocho-gu
137-030 Seoul / KR
02 / YOU, Jeong Min
102-2703 Hangang Samsung Apt.
Tojeong-dong
Mapo-gu
121-060 Seoul / KR
03 / KIM, In Hwan
ga-1501 205 Dong-a 2-cha Apt.
Sindorim-dong
Guro-gu
152-773 Seoul / KR
04 / SONG, Sung Mu
203 Cheonggiwa Village 432-14
Sindang-dong
Jung-gu
100-450 Seoul / KR
 [2017/20]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2019/16]
Former [2017/20]Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date16207428.004.12.2008
[2017/20]
Priority number, dateKR2008010576528.10.2008         Original published format: KR 20080105765
[2017/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3169042
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3169042
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W88/04, H04W88/06, H04L9/32, H04L29/08, H04W84/04
[2017/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/52]
Former [2017/20]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:INHALTSÜBERMITTLUNGSDIENSTSERVER[2018/45]
English:CONTENTS SUPPLY SERVICE SERVER[2018/45]
French:SERVEUR DE SERVICE DE FOURNITURE DE CONTENU[2018/45]
Former [2017/20]INHALTSÜBERMITTLUNGSSYSTEM, VERFAHREN, DIENSTSERVER, SPEICHERMITTEL, RELAISVERFAHREN, ANWENDUNGSSERVER UND MOBILTELEFON FÜR EIN ENDGERÄT MIT MEHREREN ANSCHLÜSSEN
Former [2017/20]A CONTENTS SUPPLY SYSTEM, A METHOD, A SERVICE SERVER, A STORAGE MEANS, A RELAY METHOD, AN APPLICATION SERVER AND A CELLULAR PHONE FOR MULTI CONNECTED END TERMINAL
Former [2017/20]SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE DE CONTENU, PROCÉDÉ, SERVEUR DE SERVICE, MOYEN DE MÉMORISATION, PROCÉDÉ DE RELAIS, SERVEUR D'APPLICATIONS ET TÉLÉPHONE CELLULAIRE POUR TERMINAL D'EXTRÉMITÉ À CONNEXIONS MULTIPLES
Examination procedure29.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2017Examination requested  [2017/52]
08.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2019Fee for grant paid
04.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08877799.0  / EP2340680
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
LV17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
PL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
BG17.07.2019
NO17.07.2019
GR18.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
LV17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
BG17.07.2019
NO17.07.2019
GR18.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/50]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
LV17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
GR18.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/49]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/48]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/47]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL17.04.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2007091699  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; KUMAR SAMPATH SWAROOP; LIM CHUN K) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2 * * page 4 - page 5 * * page 11 * * page 16 - page 17 * * claim 13 *;
 [A]US2007055743  (PIRTLE ROSS M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 3,8,12 *;
 [X]US2004254851  (HIMENO YOSHITADA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-5 * figures 2A,3,8A,8B,27 * * paragraph [0149] - paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0204] - paragraph [0258] * * paragraph [0361] - paragraph [0367] *;
 [X]US2007192443  (KIM YOUNG-HYUN [KR]) [X] 1-5 * figures 3,5 * * paragraph [0009] *