Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3203363

EP3203363 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A POSITION OF AN OBJECT IN 3D SPACE, COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND APPARATUS CONFIGURED TO CONTROL A POSITION OF AN OBJECT IN 3D SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2018  [2018/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Steinborn, Peter
Sterntalerstr. 2
31275 Lehrte / DE
02 / Zacharias, Jithin
Alfred-Messel-Weg 10 A
WG 42
64287 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Freimann, Achim
Lister Str. 26
30163 Hannover / DE
04 / Gries, Ulrich
Friedenauer Str. 20b
30419 Hannover / DE
05 / Boehm, Johannes
Sieberweg 35
37081 Göttingen / DE
06 / Kordon, Sven
Mühlenkampstraße 50 A
31515 Wunstorf / DE
 [2017/32]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/32]
Application number, filing date16305121.204.02.2016
[2017/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3203363
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0354
[2017/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER POSITION EINES OBJEKTS IM 3D-RAUM, COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER POSITION EINES OBJEKTS IM 3D-RAUM[2017/32]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A POSITION OF AN OBJECT IN 3D SPACE, COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND APPARATUS CONFIGURED TO CONTROL A POSITION OF AN OBJECT IN 3D SPACE[2017/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UNE POSITION D'UN OBJET DANS UN ESPACE 3D, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET APPAREIL CONÇU POUR COMMANDER LA POSITION D'UN TEL OBJET[2017/32]
Examination procedure10.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/32]
20.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2015177224  (DOLBY INT AB [NL]) [A] 5 * abstract *;
 [A]US2014119581  (TSINGOS NICOLAS R [US] ET AL) [A] 5 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] *;
 [A]US2011291945  (EWING JR RICHARD ALAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 41] , [0 42] *;
 [I]  - NICHOLAS KATZAKIS ET AL, "Plane-casting: 3D Cursor Control With A SmartPhone", COMPUTER HUMAN INTERACTION, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20130924), doi:10.1145/2525194.2525275, ISBN 978-1-4503-2253-9, pages 199 - 200, XP058046353 [I] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2525194.2525275
 [A]  - KRZYSZTOF PIETROSZEK ET AL, "Tiltcasting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 28TH ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE & TECHNOLOGY, UIST '15, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20151105), doi:10.1145/2807442.2807471, ISBN 978-1-4503-3779-3, pages 57 - 62, XP058076898 [A] 1-9 * Page 58-59: Chapter 'The Tiltcasting Metaphore' *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2807442.2807471
 [A]  - DORTA, T, ET AL, "Hyve-3D and rethinking the "3D cursor"", SIGGRAPH 2015: STUDIO ON, SIGGRAPH '15, New York, New York, USA, (20150101), doi:10.1145/2785585.2785586, ISBN 978-1-4503-3637-6, pages 1 - 1, XP055286045 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2785585.2785586
 [A]  - Seongkook Heo ET AL, "FloatingPad: A Touchpad Based 3D Input Device", 18th International Conference on Artificial Reality and Telexistence 2008, Yokohama, Japan, (20081201), pages 335 - 338, URL: http://www.vrsj.org/ic-at/ICAT2008_Proceedings/Papers/PO2_12.pdf, (20111125), XP055013221 [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 4.1] *