Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3209036

EP3209036 - METHOD, COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING A TARGET SOUND SCENE AT A TARGET POSITION FROM TWO OR MORE SOURCE SOUND SCENES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Freimann, Achim
Lister Str. 26
30163 Hannover / DE
02 / Zacharias, Jithin
Alfred-Messel-Weg 10 A
WG 42
64287 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Steinborn, Peter
Sterntalerstr. 2
31275 Lehrte / DE
04 / Gries, Ulrich
Friedenauer Str. 20b
30419 Hannover / DE
05 / Boehm, Johannes
Sieberweg 35
37081 Göttingen / DE
06 / Kordon, Sven
Muehlenkampstraße 50 A
31515 Wunstorf / DE
 [2017/34]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/34]
Application number, filing date16305200.419.02.2016
[2017/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3209036
Date:23.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04S7/00
[2017/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, COMPUTER-LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER ZIELTONSZENE BEI EINER ZIELPOSITION AUS ZWEI ODER MEHR QUELLTONSZENEN[2017/34]
English:METHOD, COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING A TARGET SOUND SCENE AT A TARGET POSITION FROM TWO OR MORE SOURCE SOUND SCENES[2017/34]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET APPAREIL POUR DETERMINER UNE SCÈNE SONORE CIBLE À UNE POSITION CIBLE DE DEUX OU PLUSIEURS SCÈNES SONORES SOURCE[2017/34]
Examination procedure24.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/36]
12.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2182744  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,9-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014001478  (PROVOST FELLOWS & SCHOLARS COLLEGE OF THE HOLY UNDIVIDED TRINITY OF QUEEN ELIZABETH NEAR DUBLIN [IE]) [A] 1,9-11 * the whole document *