EP3220335 - METHOD, FIRST, SECOND SERVER AND SYSTEM FOR ACCESSING A SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERHI, Roland c/o GEMALTO SA Brevets 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS cedex / FR | 02 /
SCHAETZEL, Maria c/o GEMALTO SA Brevets 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS cedex / FR | 03 /
VANDEWALLE, Laurent c/o GEMALTO SA Brevets 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS cedex / FR | 04 /
BORDAS, Aurélia c/o GEMALTO SA Brevets 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS cedex / FR | 05 /
KIEFFER, Brice c/o GEMALTO SA Brevets 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS cedex / FR | 06 /
RAFFA, Hugo c/o GEMALTO SA Brevets 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS cedex / FR | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 16305298.8 | 18.03.2016 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220335 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, H04M15/00 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0279 (EP);
H04M15/09 (EP);
H04M15/61 (EP);
H04M15/882 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, ERSTER, ZWEITER SERVER UND SYSTEM ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF EINEN DIENST | [2017/38] | English: | METHOD, FIRST, SECOND SERVER AND SYSTEM FOR ACCESSING A SERVICE | [2017/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, PREMIER, SECOND SERVEUR ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT D'ACCÉDER À UN SERVICE | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 25.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03019845 (MANTO CHARLES L [US]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [00133] - paragraph [00137] * * paragraph [00161]; claims 22-36 *; | [A]US2010241476 (FITZPATRICK DUDLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |