Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3243258

EP3243258 - WINDING FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université Catholique de Louvain
Place de l'Université 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2017/46]
Inventor(s)01 / DEHEZ, Bruno
Route de Perwez 118
5310 Liernu / BE
02 / BAUDART, François
Rue des trappistes 53
6464 Bourlers / BE
 [2017/46]
Representative(s)Pecher, Nicolas , et al
Pecher & Partners
Rue Louis de Geer, 6
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2017/46]
Application number, filing date16700177.507.01.2016
[2017/46]
WO2016EP50229
Priority number, dateEP2015015039207.01.2015         Original published format: EP 15150392
[2017/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016110549
Date:14.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3243258
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2016
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02K3/26
[2017/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/46]
TitleGerman:WICKLUNG FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE[2017/46]
English:WINDING FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE[2017/46]
French:ENROULEMENT POUR MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE[2017/46]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2017National basic fee paid 
27.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/46]
27.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]WO2014207174  (UNIV LOUVAIN [BE]) [X] 1-8,10,11,13,15,18 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1,7a,8; claims 1,4,6,7,8,10,11,13 * [A] 9,12,14 [Y] 16,17 [I] 20;
 [X]EP1073179  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0051]; figures 1-4,9 *;
 [Y]WO2007014570  (FESTO AG & CO [DE], et al) [Y] 17 * figure 4 *
 [Y]  - Duane Hanselman, "Motor Design Possibilities", Brushless Permanent Magnet Motor Design, Lebanon, Ohio, USA, Magna Physics Publishing, (20060101), ISBN 978-1-881855-15-6, XP055261733 [Y] 16 * paragraphs 5.3 and 5.4 *