Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3262748

EP3262748 - SENSORLESS COMMUTATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBM-Papst Mulfingen GmbH&CO. KG
Bachmühle 2
74673 Mulfingen / DE
[2018/01]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Fabian
Veilchenweg 3
74585 Rot am See / DE
 [2018/01]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/01]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16700502.414.01.2016
[2018/01]
WO2016EP50698
Priority number, dateDE20151010256523.02.2015         Original published format: DE102015102565
[2018/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016134877
Date:01.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3262748
Date:03.01.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016
[2018/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02P6/182, H02P21/13, H02P21/24, H02P21/04
[2018/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
TitleGerman:SENSORLOSES KOMMUTIERUNGSVERFAHREN[2018/01]
English:SENSORLESS COMMUTATION METHOD[2018/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION SANS CAPTEUR[2018/01]
Entry into regional phase17.08.2017National basic fee paid 
17.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
17.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1758240  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
 [XI]  - ROLANDO P BURGOS ET AL, "Design and Evaluation of a PLL-Based Position Controller for Sensorless Vector Control of Permanent-Magnet Synchronous Machines", IEEE INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IECON 2006 - 32ND ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20061101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0135-2, pages 5081 - 5086, XP031077770 [X] 6-11,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 1-5,12
 [XI]  - LIN QINGHUA ET AL, "A novel position detection method of sensorless brushless DC motor based on sliding mode observer", POWER ELECTRONICS SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS (PESA), 2011 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110608), doi:10.1109/PESA.2011.5982898, ISBN 978-1-4577-0205-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031925352 [X] 6-11,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 1-5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESA.2011.5982898
 [XAI]  - OLIVIERI C ET AL, "A novel PLL scheme for a sensorless PMSM drive overcoming common speed reversal problems", POWER ELECTRONICS, ELECTRICAL DRIVES, AUTOMATION AND MOTION (SPEEDAM), 2012 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20120620), doi:10.1109/SPEEDAM.2012.6264468, ISBN 978-1-4673-1299-8, pages 1051 - 1056, XP032221790 [X] 6-11,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 16,17 [I] 1-5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SPEEDAM.2012.6264468