Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3245337

EP3245337 - BRIDGING DEVICE FOR A MOVABLE BRIDGE, AND MOVABLE BRIDGE COMPRISING A BRIDGING DEVICE OF SAID TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maurer Söhne Engineering GmbH & Co. KG
Frankfurter Ring 193
80807 München / DE
[2017/47]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÜRMANN, Christian
Azaleenweg 12
44289 Dortmund / DE
 [2017/47]
Representative(s)von Hirschhausen, Helge
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
[2017/47]
Application number, filing date16700576.813.01.2016
[2017/47]
WO2016EP50577
Priority number, dateDE20151020041914.01.2015         Original published format: DE102015200419
[2017/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016113312
Date:21.07.2016
Language:DE
[2016/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3245337
Date:22.11.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2016
[2017/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3245337
Date:12.12.2018
Language:DE
[2018/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:E01D19/06, E01D15/00
[2017/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERBRÜCKUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BEWEGLICHE BRÜCKE UND BEWEGLICHE BRÜCKE MIT EINER SOLCHEN ÜBERBRÜCKUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2017/47]
English:BRIDGING DEVICE FOR A MOVABLE BRIDGE, AND MOVABLE BRIDGE COMPRISING A BRIDGING DEVICE OF SAID TYPE[2017/47]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PONTAGE POUR UN PONT MOBILE ET PONT MOBILE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE PONTAGE[2017/47]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2017National basic fee paid 
28.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/47]
28.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2018Fee for grant paid
26.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)13.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
MC12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SI12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
LU13.01.2019
CH31.01.2019
LI31.01.2019
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2019/50]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
MC12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SI12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
LU13.01.2019
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/48]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
MC12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
LU13.01.2019
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/45]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
MC12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
LU13.01.2019
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/44]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
LU13.01.2019
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/25]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/23]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1355009  (MAURER FRIEDRICH SOEHNE [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0821104  (MAURER FRIEDRICH SOEHNE [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [X]US1807907  (ARTHUR FOSHAY, et al) [X] 1,5,7-9,15,21,22 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS625097