Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3183134

EP3183134 - WINDOW ASSEMBLY AND VEHICLE DOOR AND VEHICLE FEATURING THE WINDOW ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cooper Standard GmbH
Bregenzer Straße 133
88131 Lindau / DE
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / KRAUSE, Fritz
Sennereiweg 6
88145 Hergatz / DE
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 20
80335 München / DE
[2017/26]
Application number, filing date16700849.918.01.2016
[2017/26]
WO2016EP50924
Priority number, dateEP2015019266502.11.2015         Original published format: EP 15192665
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017076513
Date:11.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3183134
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017
[2017/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3183134
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60J10/76, B60J10/77, B60J10/79, B60J5/04
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHEIBENANORDNUNG UND FAHRZEUGTÜR UND FAHRZEUG MIT DER SCHEIBENANORDNUNG[2017/29]
English:WINDOW ASSEMBLY AND VEHICLE DOOR AND VEHICLE FEATURING THE WINDOW ASSEMBLY[2017/26]
French:ENSEMBLE FENÊTRE ET PORTE DE VÉHICULE ET VÉHICULE PRÉSENTANT L'ENSEMBLE FENÊTRE[2017/26]
Former [2017/26]SCHEIBENANORDNUNG UND FAHRZEUGTÜR AND FAHRZEUG MIT DER SCHEIBENANORDNUNG
Entry into regional phase22.12.2016National basic fee paid 
22.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/26]
22.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2017Fee for grant paid
22.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IE18.01.2018
LU18.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
[2019/09]
Former [2018/50]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
LU18.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/47]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
LU18.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL04.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP0161685  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-12,14,15 * figures 1,2,3; claims 1,5 * * page 6, line 13 - page 8, line 15 * [I] 8,13;
 [XI]US2013305612  (MURREE STEVE J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,13-15 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 36 * [I] 9,10;
 [AD]DE102014005721  (AUDI AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0029]; figures 1,2,3; claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP2142394  (METZELER AUTOMOTIVE PROFILE [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 1,3,4,6,7,8,9; claim 1 *
by applicantEP2142394
 EP1794402
 US2012002556
 DE102005013581
 DE102014005721