Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3319852

EP3319852 - METHOD FOR THE ANTICIPATORY STARTING OF A HEAT ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2018/20]
Inventor(s)01 / LE CAM, Florent
9 Rue du Château d'Eau
91510 Lardy / FR
02 / ROUDEAU, Frédéric
13 Rue de la Paix
94400 Vitry sur Seine / FR
 [2018/20]
Representative(s)Rougemont, Bernard
Renault s.a.s
TCR GRA 2 36 - Sce 00267
1, Avenue du Golf
78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
[2018/20]
Application number, filing date16702190.614.01.2016
[2018/20]
WO2016FR50060
Priority number, dateFR2015005642807.07.2015         Original published format: FR 1556428
[2018/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017005996
Date:12.01.2017
Language:FR
[2017/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3319852
Date:16.05.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60W10/06, B60W20/00, B60W50/00, B60W20/10, B60K6/48
[2018/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM VORAUSSCHAUENDEN STARTEN EINES WÄRMEMOTORS[2018/20]
English:METHOD FOR THE ANTICIPATORY STARTING OF A HEAT ENGINE[2018/20]
French:PROCEDE D'ANTICIPATION DU DEMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR THERMIQUE[2018/20]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2017National basic fee paid 
22.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/20]
22.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2005211479  (TAMOR MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,6,8;
 [XI]GB2508670  (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 1 - page 23, line 4; figures 1-4 * [I] 3-9;
 [IA]DE102009045567  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-3B * [A] 3-9
by applicantUS7407026