Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3319852


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.01.2020 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.01.2019 Change - classification published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
14.09.2018 Change: Validation states published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
14.09.2018 Change - extension states published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
06.06.2018 Amendment by applicant
13.04.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.05.2018  [2018/20]
13.04.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
13.04.2018 Request for examination filed published on  16.05.2018  [2018/20]
23.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
30.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
06.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
24.11.2017 Change - representative
24.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
13.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication