Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3235281

EP3235281 - WIRELESS CONNECTIVITY USING WHITE SPACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.04.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
15.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / HASSAN, Amer A.
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / GARNETT, Paul W.
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / MITCHELL, Paul William Alexander
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date16703678.922.01.2016
[2017/43]
WO2016US14410
Priority number, dateUS20151460426423.01.2015         Original published format: US201514604264
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016118795
Date:28.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3235281
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/14, // H04W64/00, H04W88/04, G01S19/14
[2019/51]
Former International [2017/43]H04W16/14, H04W64/00, H04W88/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSKONNEKTIVITÄT MITTELS WHITESPACES[2017/43]
English:WIRELESS CONNECTIVITY USING WHITE SPACES[2017/43]
French:CONNECTIVITÉ SANS FIL À L'AIDE DES ESPACES BLANCS[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2017National basic fee paid 
20.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
20.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2802089  (ANDREW WIRELESS SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,11,15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] * [I] 7,12-14;
 [XI]US2012238304  (LAMBERT PAUL A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11,15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0028] , [0029] , [0035] - [0044] - [0049] - [0052] * [I] 7-10,12-14;
 [I]US2014301242  (HASSAN AMER A [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0022] - [0034] - [0038] - [0045] *