Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3259424

EP3259424 - PIVOTAL FITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/52]PIVOTING FITTING
[2018/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hettich Holding GmbH & Co. oHG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2017/52]
Inventor(s)01 / KAISER, Andre
Bleekerfeld 14
33739 Bielefeld / DE
02 / MONTECCHIO, Andreas
Gröchteweg 53
32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE
 [2017/52]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/52]
Application number, filing date16704452.815.02.2016
[2017/52]
WO2016EP53179
Priority number, dateDE20151010239319.02.2015         Original published format: DE102015102393
[2017/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016131780
Date:25.08.2016
Language:DE
[2016/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3259424
Date:27.12.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016
[2017/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3259424
Date:14.11.2018
Language:DE
[2018/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:E05F1/10
[2017/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHWENKBESCHLAG[2017/52]
English:PIVOTAL FITTING[2018/30]
French:FERRURE D'ARTICULATION[2018/30]
Former [2017/52]PIVOTING FITTING
Former [2017/52]FERRURE PIVOTANTE
Entry into regional phase19.09.2017National basic fee paid 
19.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/52]
19.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2018Fee for grant paid
27.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
[2019/45]
Former [2019/40]AL14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03097973  (HUWIL WERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10,12 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US4768762  (LUND KURT O [US]) [X] 1,2,6-10,13,14 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 12 * * column 3, line 56 - line 68; figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]WO2010051569  (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 7; figures 1-7 * [A] 4