Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3286552

EP3286552 - CONTAINER INSPECTION DEVICE AND CONTAINER INSPECTION METHOD FOR INSPECTING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2018/09]
Inventor(s)01 / WILL, Christof
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
02 / NIEDERMEIER, Anton
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
03 / AICHINGER, Karl
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
04 / KLINGER, Reinhard
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
05 / PIANA, Stefan
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
 [2018/09]
Representative(s)Schuhbießer, Irmgard Gertrud
Schuhbießer-Patent
Holzgartenstraße 6
93059 Regensburg / DE
[2018/09]
Application number, filing date16705063.208.02.2016
[2018/09]
WO2016EP52635
Priority number, dateDE20151010601320.04.2015         Original published format: DE102015106013
[2018/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016169667
Date:27.10.2016
Language:DE
[2016/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3286552
Date:28.02.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/88, G01N21/90, H05B37/02
[2018/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/09]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTERINSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND BEHÄLTERINSPEKTIONSVERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION VON BEHÄLTERN[2018/09]
English:CONTAINER INSPECTION DEVICE AND CONTAINER INSPECTION METHOD FOR INSPECTING CONTAINERS[2018/09]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION DE RÉCIPIENTS ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION DE RÉCIPIENTS POUR L'INSPECTION DE RÉCIPIENTS[2018/09]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2017National basic fee paid 
12.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/09]
17.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2001028227  (LYS IHOR [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0127]; figures 1-3, 6, 9-12, 16, 99 * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0304] *;
 [Y]US2005174473  (MORGAN FREDERICK M [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0017]; figures 2, 6A, 17, 18 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0272] - paragraph [0273] *;
 [Y]US2012176735  (DAVIS ADAM [US]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] *;
 [Y]DE102013106894  (KRONES AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [Y]US2009033761  (CETRULO RAFFAELE A [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0050]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] *;
 [A]US2013083330  (PIANA STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0014]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4668983  (WERSON MICHAEL J [GB]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [AD]DE10017126  (KRONES AG [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * figures 1, 2 *
 [Y]  - Perry West, "High speed, real-time machine vision", Automated Vision Systems Inc., Cybertronics, US, (20030406), US, URL: http://www.imagenation.com/pdf/highspeed.pdf, (20160414), XP002756523 [Y] 1-9 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 12, paragraph 4 - page 13, paragraph 3; figure 15 * * page 16, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 8; figure 19 * * page 26, paragraph 4 * * page 31 - page 36, paragraph 1; figure 24 *
by applicantDE10017126