Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3262084

EP3262084 - HIGH-PRESSURE POLYMERIZATION PROCESS OF ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[2018/01]
Inventor(s)01 / WOLFRAM, Sven
Amundsenstrasse 92
53881 Euskirchen / DE
02 / FINETTE, Andre-Armand
Sperberweg 20
50997 Köln / DE
03 / BACKES, Udo
Koelnerstrasse 96
53894 Mechernich / DE
04 / GONIOUKH, Andrei
Am Kapellenbusch 15
50374 Erftstadt / DE
05 / CABUK, Hicran
Am Wildzaun 2
53842 Troisdorf / DE
 [2018/01]
Representative(s)Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. E413, 5.OG
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/01]Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. B852, 5th floor
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date16706573.922.02.2016
[2018/01]
WO2016EP53628
Priority number, dateEP2015015614623.02.2015         Original published format: EP 15156146
[2018/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016135077
Date:01.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3262084
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016
[2018/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3262084
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/01
[2018/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHDRUCKPOLYMERISIERUNGSVERFAHREN VON ETHYLENISCH UNGESÄTTIGTEN MONOMEREN[2018/01]
English:HIGH-PRESSURE POLYMERIZATION PROCESS OF ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS[2018/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE POLYMÉRISATION HAUTE PRESSION DE MONOMÈRES ÉTHYLÉNIQUEMENT INSATURÉS[2018/01]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2017National basic fee paid 
04.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
04.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2018Fee for grant paid
16.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.06.2018
AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
LU22.02.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
LU22.02.2019
Former [2019/45]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/26]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2018/52]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
NO06.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010081684  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002132936  (KENDRICK JAMES AUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0201308
 WO2008148758
    - CHEM. ING. TECH., (1995), vol. 67, pages 862 - 864