Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3264943

EP3264943 - PIECE OF FURNITURE, AND FURNITURE FITTING FOR CONNECTING FURNITURE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hettich Franke GmbH & Co. KG
Hinter dem Ziegelwasen 6/1
72336 Balingen-Weilstetten / DE
[2018/02]
Inventor(s)01 / STAUSS, Gerd
Steinstraße 3
72474 Winterlingen / DE
02 / NILL, Oliver
Reuteweg 1
72379 Hechingen / DE
 [2018/02]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/02]
Application number, filing date16707442.602.03.2016
[2018/02]
WO2016EP54405
Priority number, dateDE20151010322505.03.2015         Original published format: DE102015103225
DE20161010075318.01.2016         Original published format: DE102016100753
[2018/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016139237
Date:09.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3264943
Date:10.01.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2016
[2018/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3264943
Date:23.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47C13/00, A47C7/42, A47C7/54, F16B12/26
[2018/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MÖBEL UND MÖBELBESCHLAG ZUR VERBINDUNG VON MÖBELTEILEN[2018/02]
English:PIECE OF FURNITURE, AND FURNITURE FITTING FOR CONNECTING FURNITURE PARTS[2018/02]
French:MEUBLE ET FERRURE DE MEUBLE POUR RELIER DES PARTIES DE MEUBLE[2018/02]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2017National basic fee paid 
28.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/02]
28.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.11.2018Fee for grant paid
30.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.12.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
07.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/33]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL23.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]EP2796074  (LUSCH GMBH & CO KG FERD [DE]) [I] 1,19 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0036]; figure 4A *;
 [A]EP2792276  (DONATI SPA [IT]) [A] 1,19 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2007120410  (WIECEK GLENN N [US]) [A] 1,19 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-6 *
by applicantAT502027