blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3270987

EP3270987 - CALIBRATION OF AN INFUSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/04]METHOD FOR CALIBRATING AN INFUSION DEVICE
[2019/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fresenius Vial SAS
Patent Department Medical Devices Division
Le Grand Chemin BP 3
38590 Brézins / FR
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / AMON, Barbara
Panoramaweg 1
65510 Idstein / DE
02 / BECKER, Michael
Am Mühlkanal 40
75438 Knittlingen / DE
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department - MedTech
Else-Kröner-Straße 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/22]Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department
Else-Kröner-Straße 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Former [2018/04]Kusche, Robert
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department Medical Devices Division
Else-Kröner-Straße 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Application number, filing date16707719.702.03.2016
[2018/04]
WO2016EP54347
Priority number, dateWO2015EP29007517.03.2015         Original published format: PCT/EP2015/290075
[2018/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016146382
Date:22.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3270987
Date:24.01.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3270987
Date:27.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/142, F04B43/12, A61M5/14
[2018/04]
CPC:
A61M5/14232 (EP); A61M5/14228 (EP); F04B51/00 (EP);
A61M2205/18 (EP); A61M2205/3327 (EP); A61M2205/3334 (EP);
A61M2205/3351 (EP); A61M2205/3355 (EP); A61M2205/702 (EP);
A61M5/1413 (EP); F04B43/1207 (EP); F04B43/14 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KALIBRIERUNG EINES INFUSIONSGERÄTS[2019/51]
English:CALIBRATION OF AN INFUSION DEVICE[2019/51]
French:CALIBRAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PERFUSION[2019/51]
Former [2018/04]VERFAHREN ZUR KALIBRIERUNG EINER INFUSIONSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2018/04]METHOD FOR CALIBRATING AN INFUSION DEVICE
Former [2018/04]PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PERFUSION
Entry into regional phase17.10.2017National basic fee paid 
17.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/04]
17.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2020Fee for grant paid
17.04.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.04.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.03.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.03.2016
AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
MK27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
[2024/22]
Former [2023/33]HU02.03.2016
AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2023/30]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/45]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL27.05.2020
AT27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
IT27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS27.09.2020
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO9831935  (PHALLEN IVER J [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * figures 5, 5a-b * * page 1, lines 37-39 * * page 4, lines 37-38 * * page 7, lines 18-21 * * page 30, lines 11-14 * [Y] 1,10-15 [I] 2-9;
 [I]WO2009026060  (MALLINCKRODT INC [US], et al) [I] 1,15 * figures 1, 3 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0 35] *;
 [XI]WO2009113075  (MEDINGO LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,15 * figures 13c, 14a * * paragraphs [0036] , [0 53] - [0055] * [I] 2-9;
 [YD]WO2012049260  (FRESENIUS KABI DE GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1,10-15* the whole document *
by applicantWO2012049260
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.