Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3262146

EP3262146 - LUBRICANT FORMULATIONS WITH ENHANCED ANTI-WEAR AND EXTREME PRESSURE PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2018/01]
Inventor(s)01 / KOTNIS, Ashish
1250 Harmon Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
02 / GREAVES, Martin R.
Bachtobelstrasse 3
CH-8810 Horgen / CH
03 / KHEMCHANDANI, Govindlal
P.O. Box 54173
Pittsburgh, PA. 15244 / US
 [2018/01]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/01]Raynor, John
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date16708055.522.02.2016
[2018/01]
WO2016US18920
Priority number, dateUS201562120921P26.02.2015         Original published format: US 201562120921 P
[2018/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016137882
Date:01.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3262146
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016
[2018/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3262146
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:C10M141/10, C10N30/06, C10N40/04
[2018/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHMIERMITTELFORMULIERUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER VERSCHLEISS- UND EXTREMDRUCKLEISTUNG[2018/01]
English:LUBRICANT FORMULATIONS WITH ENHANCED ANTI-WEAR AND EXTREME PRESSURE PERFORMANCE[2018/01]
French:FORMULATIONS LUBRIFIANTES DOUÉES D'UNE PERFORMANCE ANTI-USURE ET SOUS PRESSION EXTRÊME AMÉLIORÉE[2018/01]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2017National basic fee paid 
21.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
21.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2018Fee for grant paid
15.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)27.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.12.2018
AT26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
DK26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
MC26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
IE22.02.2019
LU22.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/04]AL26.12.2018
AT26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
DK26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
MC26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
LU22.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/48]AL26.12.2018
AT26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
DK26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
MC26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
LU22.02.2019
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/47]AL26.12.2018
AT26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
MC26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
LU22.02.2019
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/46]AL26.12.2018
AT26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
MC26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/45]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
MC26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2014066076  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, last paragraph; page 4, lines 10-17; page 4, line 23 to page 5, line 2; page 5, lines 18, 19;; example -; claims 1,8,9; table 1 *;
 [A]EP0531000  (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 50, lines 38-54; page 56, lines 1-16; page 59, lines 50-57; page 60, lines 4-7; *;
 [A]WO9200367  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, lines 18-24; page 2, lines, 1-6, 22; page 3, lines 33, 34; page 5, lines 1-9; page 11, lines 7-10;; example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO2014189712  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5135670