blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3377730 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3377730



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 531
25.06.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.06.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 36
16.05.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.04.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
25.04.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.04.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.04.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.04.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
12.04.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
02.04.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 36
26.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
26.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
21.02.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.02.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
06.02.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 36
14.01.2019 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
02.01.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.01.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.01.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.01.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
02.01.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
29.11.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.10.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
12.09.2018 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
12.09.2018 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
03.09.2018 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
29.08.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.06.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
12.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.06.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
12.06.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 29
12.06.2018 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
12.06.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
12.06.2018 Annex Search / examination 41
12.06.2018 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
12.06.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
12.06.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
12.06.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
05.06.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
27.10.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.01.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
22.12.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.12.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 34
29.11.2016 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
03.08.2016 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
01.08.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
01.08.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
01.08.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
29.03.2016 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.02.2016 Abstract International Searching Authority 2
29.02.2016 Claims International Searching Authority 3
29.02.2016 Description International Searching Authority 20
29.02.2016 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
29.02.2016 Drawings International Searching Authority 10
29.02.2016 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 1
29.02.2016 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
29.02.2016 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
29.02.2016 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
29.02.2016 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 7