Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3377730


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.02.2020 [2020/07]
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
10.05.2019 (Expected) grant published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
04.05.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.04.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.04.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.02.2019 Change - representative
18.02.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.01.2019 Change: Validation states published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
18.01.2019 Change - extension states published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
01.01.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.08.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
24.08.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
24.08.2018 Request for examination filed published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
28.07.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.06.2018 Change - representative
16.06.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.06.2018 Amendment by applicant
06.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2016 PCT data prior to European publication