blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3377730
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3377730Global Dossier 12.06.2019B1
EP3377730 26.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
BG11214915 16.11.2015
WO2016BG00004 04.02.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3377730T 26.08.2019T3
Priority number Date
BG11214915 16.11.2015
WO2016BG00004 04.02.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016201529Global Dossier 22.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
BG11214915 16.11.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BG112149 31.03.2016A
Priority number Date
BG11214915 16.11.2015