blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP3377730

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FILapse: 12.06.2019
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LTLapse: 12.06.2019
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NOLapse: 12.09.2019
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Validation states MA 
 MD 
Examination procedure25.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase04.06.2018National basic fee paid 
04.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted12.06.2019
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.09.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Countries concerned:MA MD
 
Event date:26.09.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:26.09.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20180612
 
Event date:26.09.2018 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:23.01.2019 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20190102
 
Event date:20.02.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:20.02.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:27.03.2019 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20190226
 
Event date:08.05.2019 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20190412
 
Event date:12.06.2019 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:12.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:14.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1142768 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20190615
 
Event date:04.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602016015147 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:10.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:26.08.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20190823