Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3377730

EP3377730 - DEVICE FOR CONVERTING RECIPROCATING MOTION INTO ROTARY MOTION AND VICE VERSA, IN AXIAL-PISTON MECHANICAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ksimetro -Tatiana Nikolova Ltd
12 Asen lordanov Bul
Office 511
Sofia 1592 / BG
[2018/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BRASTINKOV, Lachezar, Alexandrov
Kv.Vitosha
5 lana lazova Str.
Fl.3, Apt. 5
Sofia 1700 / BG
02 / NIKOLOVA, Tatiana, Nikolova
Kv.Vitosha
5 lana lazova Str.
Fl.3, Apt. 5
Sofia 1700 / BG
03 / BRASTINKOVA, Nevena, Lachezarova
Kv.Vitosha
5 lana lazova Str.
Fl.3, Apt. 5
Sofia 1700 / BG
 [2018/39]
Representative(s)Hristova, Lilyana
RP Partners Ltd.
11, Slaveikov sq., fl.1, office 5
1000 Sofia / BG
[2019/24]
Former [2018/39]Kostadinova, Rossitsa Kirilova
Patent and Trademark Attorney
11 Slaveikov sq.
Floor 1, office 5
1000 Sofia / BG
Application number, filing date16708581.004.02.2016
[2018/39]
WO2016BG00004
Priority number, dateBG2015011214916.11.2015         Original published format: BG 11214915
[2018/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016201529
Date:22.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3377730
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016
[2018/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3377730
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:F01B3/04, F01B9/06, F16H25/12
[2018/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMWANDLUNG EINER KOLBENBEWEGUNG IN EINE DREHBEWEGUNG UND UMGEKEHRT BEI MECHANISCHEN AXIALKOLBENSYSTEMEN[2018/39]
English:DEVICE FOR CONVERTING RECIPROCATING MOTION INTO ROTARY MOTION AND VICE VERSA, IN AXIAL-PISTON MECHANICAL SYSTEMS[2018/39]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR CONVERTIR UN MOUVEMENT DE ALTERNATIF EN UN MOUVEMENT ROTATIF ET INVERSEMENT, DANS DES SYSTÈMES MÉCANIQUES À PISTONS AXIAUX[2018/39]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2018National basic fee paid 
04.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/39]
12.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2019Fee for grant paid
24.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
[2019/47]
Cited inInternational search[X]US1565184  (MILLER LLOYD W) [X] 1-16 * figure 1 *;
 [X]FR782997  (LILES) [X] 1-16 * figure 1 *;
 [X]FR820406  (VUIGLIO) [X] 1-16 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4090478  (TRIMBLE JAMES A, et al) [X] 1-16 * column 8, line 30 - line 41; figures 2,6 *;
 [X]WO8805495  (GEELONG ENGINE CO PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-16 * page 5, line 25 - line 37; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE10342257  (DEICHMANN JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1,5; claim 9 *;
 [X]WO2011115595  (DILMAN SAADETTIN FERDA [TR]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [X]US3786790  (PLEVYAK J) [X] 1-16 * column 4, line 27 - line 31; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE2552081  (RICO PETER) [X] 1-16 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0637677  (FOEDISCH MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-16 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 6; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2003056611  (MORENO-APARICIO MANUEL [ES]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0044] *;
 [X]WO2005003595  (SEGMENT S R O [SK], et al) [X] 1-16 * figure 1; claim 3 *;
 [A]US3587538  (POOLE EDWARD M) [A] 6 * column 3, line 14 - line 30 *
by applicantUS8820275
 DE3712458
 GB304701
 DE102008048495