Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3269176

EP3269176 - RESOURCE PARTITIONING BETWEEN WIRELESS BACKHAUL AND ACCESS COMMUNICATIONS IN MILLIMETER WAVE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2019/46]
Former [2018/03]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
ATTN: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ISLAM, Muhammad Nazmul
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / SAMPATH, Ashwin
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / LI, Junyi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / ZHANG, Zhenliang
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date16709194.119.02.2016
[2018/03]
WO2016US18663
Priority number, dateUS201562132624P13.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562132624 P
US20151484334502.09.2015         Original published format: US201514843345
[2018/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016148838
Date:22.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3269176
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016
[2018/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/26, H04W24/02, // H04W84/18, H04W92/12, H04W76/10
[2019/45]
Former International [2018/03]H04W28/26, H04W76/02, H04W84/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
TitleGerman:RESSOURCENAUFTEILUNG ZWISCHEN DRAHTLOS-BACKHAUL UND ZUGANGSKOMMUNIKATIONEN IN MILLIMETERWELLENNETZWERKEN[2018/03]
English:RESOURCE PARTITIONING BETWEEN WIRELESS BACKHAUL AND ACCESS COMMUNICATIONS IN MILLIMETER WAVE NETWORKS[2018/03]
French:PARTITIONNEMENT DE RESSOURCES ENTRE DES COMMUNICATIONS DE LIAISON SECONDAIRE SANS FIL ET D'ACCÈS DANS DES RÉSEAUX À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES[2019/45]
Former [2018/03]PARTITIONNEMENT DE RESSOURCES ENTRE DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL PAR LIAISON TERRESTRE ET D'ACCÈS DANS DES RÉSEAUX À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES
Entry into regional phase02.08.2017National basic fee paid 
02.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.08.2017Examination requested  [2018/03]
02.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2013170169  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1-10,14,18-27,29,30 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0155] * [I] 11-13,15-17,28;
 [A]WO2013086410  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0085] *;
 [A]WO2015010296  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 13, line 29 - line 36; figure 9 *