Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3267842

EP3267842 - ELECTROMOTIVE DUAL DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststrasse 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2018/03]
Inventor(s)01 / KLIMM, Hartmut
Schwartemeierstraße 24
32257 Bünde / DE
02 / DÜCK, Heinrich
Weißdornstraße 65
32339 Espelkamp / DE
03 / MÜLLER, Christian
Kreuzkuhlenweg 8
32369 Rahden / DE
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date16709466.311.03.2016
[2018/03]
WO2016EP55363
Priority number, dateDE201520101316U13.03.2015         Original published format: DE 202015101316 U
[2018/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016146547
Date:22.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3267842
Date:17.01.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016
[2018/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3267842
Date:22.05.2019
Language:DE
[2019/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16H57/02, A47C19/02, F16H25/20, F16H57/03, A47C20/04
[2018/51]
Former International [2018/03]A47C20/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMOTORISCHER DOPPELANTRIEB[2018/03]
English:ELECTROMOTIVE DUAL DRIVE[2018/03]
French:ENTRAÎNEMENT DOUBLE À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2018/03]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2017National basic fee paid 
12.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/03]
12.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2019Fee for grant paid
11.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP1266439  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE202004020384U  (OKIN GES FUER ANTRIEBSTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10047037  (FRANKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP1266439
 DE202013101521U