Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3267844

EP3267844 - ELECTROMOTIVE DRIVE FOR FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2019/24]
Former [2018/03]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KLIMM, Hartmut
Schwartemeierstraße 24
32257 Bünde / DE
02 / PETERS, Willy
Mozartstraße 13
32339 Espelkamp / DE
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date16709469.711.03.2016
[2018/03]
WO2016EP55369
Priority number, dateDE201520101318U13.03.2015         Original published format: DE 202015101318 U
[2018/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016146549
Date:22.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3267844
Date:17.01.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016
[2018/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3267844
Date:12.06.2019
Language:DE
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04
[2018/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMOTORISCHER MÖBELANTRIEB[2018/03]
English:ELECTROMOTIVE DRIVE FOR FURNITURE[2018/03]
French:ENTRAÎNEMENT À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE POUR MEUBLE[2018/03]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2017National basic fee paid 
12.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/03]
12.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2019Fee for grant paid
30.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/07]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]DE202008016049U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 45 *;
 [A]DE19647544  (HANNING ELEKTRO WERKE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE20302139U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *