Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3259523

EP3259523 - COMPACT HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY SYSTEM HAVING UNIFORM IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lumus Ltd
2 Bergman Street
7670502 Rehovot / IL
[2019/32]
Former [2017/52]For all designated states
Lumus Ltd
2 Bergman Street
7670502 Rehovot / IL
Inventor(s)01 / AMITAI, Yaakov
Sireni 36/4
7622924 Rehovot / IL
 [2017/52]
Representative(s)Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o
Ul. Kilinskiego 185
90-348 Lodz / PL
[2019/32]
Former [2017/52]Hoppler, Justin , et al
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG
Eigerstrasse 2
Postfach
3000 Bern 14 / CH
Application number, filing date16710013.010.02.2016
[2017/52]
WO2016IL50158
Priority number, dateIL2015023733719.02.2015         Original published format: IL 23733715
[2017/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016132347
Date:25.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3259523
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016
[2017/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3259523
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:F21V8/00, G02B27/01, G02B27/14
[2017/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMPAKTES KOPFMONTIERTES ANZEIGESYSTEM MIT GLEICHFÖRMIGEM BILD[2017/52]
English:COMPACT HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY SYSTEM HAVING UNIFORM IMAGE[2017/52]
French:SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE COMPACT À PORTER SUR LA TÊTE, COMPORTANT UNE IMAGE UNIFORME[2017/52]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2017National basic fee paid 
18.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/52]
18.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2019Fee for grant paid
25.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19190146.1  / EP3587916
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT07.08.2019
NO07.11.2019
[2020/08]
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010111472  (DEJONG CHRISTIAN DEAN [US]) [X] 1-3,23,25,26 * figure 2 * [I] 4,5,7-9,13,18-21,24;
 [XYI]WO2006098097  (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,11-17,23-26 * figures 7,11 * [Y] 21,22 [I] 6,10,18-20;
 [Y]EP2530510  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 21,22 * figure 6 *;
 [A]US2008094586  (HIRAYAMA YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 2,4-6 * paragraph [0087]; figure 6B *;
 [A]WO2009009268  (MICROVISION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * figures 2B,3B *
by applicantWO0195027
 WO03081320
 WO2005024485
 WO2005024491
 WO2005024969
 WO2005124427
 WO2006013565
 WO2006085309
 WO2006085310
 WO2006087709
 WO2007054928
 WO2007093983
 WO2008023367
 WO2008129539
 WO2008149339
 WO2013175465
 IL232197D
 IL235642D
 IL236490D
 IL236491D