blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3277126 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3277126



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 253
23.08.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.08.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.08.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.04.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.02.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
11.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
11.02.2019 Description Search / examination 3
11.02.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.02.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
08.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
08.02.2019 Description Search / examination 3
08.02.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.12.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.11.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.08.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.07.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.05.2018 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
09.05.2018 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
10.01.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.11.2017 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.10.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
25.10.2017 Priority search results Search / examination 5
25.10.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.10.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
11.08.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
27.10.2016 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
27.10.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.10.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
06.10.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
06.10.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 45
24.06.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
24.06.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.06.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
06.04.2016 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
29.03.2016 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
17.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
17.03.2016 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
17.03.2016 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
17.03.2016 Description PCT receiving Office 22
17.03.2016 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
17.03.2016 Drawings PCT receiving Office 17
17.03.2016 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4