blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3277126


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.08.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.04.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.11.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.08.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.08.2018 First examination report
08.06.2018 Change: Validation states published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
08.06.2018 Change - extension states published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
03.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
05.01.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
05.01.2018 Request for examination filed published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
13.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
27.10.2017 Amendment by applicant
25.10.2017 Change - representative
25.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
14.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
30.03.2016 PCT data prior to European publication