blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3277126 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680019780 EP16710205



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107438382Global Dossier 05.12.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2016EP55768 17.03.2016
DE102015105131 02.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3277126Global Dossier 07.02.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016EP55768 17.03.2016
DE102015105131 02.04.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016156049Global Dossier 06.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE102015105131 02.04.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102015105131 06.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE102015105131 02.04.2015