Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3277126

EP3277126 - WALL, PARTICULARLY A SIDE WALL, FOR A DRAWER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2018/06]
Inventor(s)01 / RÜTER, Stefan
Wulferdingsenerstrasse 65
32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE
02 / ROCKLAGE, Volker
Bieler Str. 15
33649 Bielefeld / DE
03 / KOHRS, Tobias
Jägerweg 10
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
 [2018/06]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/06]
Application number, filing date16710205.217.03.2016
[2018/06]
WO2016EP55768
Priority number, dateDE20151010513102.04.2015         Original published format: DE102015105131
[2018/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016156049
Date:06.10.2016
Language:DE
[2016/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3277126
Date:07.02.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016
[2018/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/00
[2018/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/06]
TitleGerman:ZARGE, INSBESONDERE SEITENZARGE, FÜR EINEN SCHUBKASTEN[2018/06]
English:WALL, PARTICULARLY A SIDE WALL, FOR A DRAWER[2018/06]
French:CHÂSSIS, NOTAMMENT CHÂSSIS LATÉRAL POUR UN TIROIR[2018/06]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2017National basic fee paid 
25.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/06]
25.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1614369  (BLUM GMBH) [X] 1-26 * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]DE202005008286U  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1-26 * figures 1-24 *;
 [X]EP1084655  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO) [X] 1-26 * figures 1-18 *;
 [X]WO2012156390  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1-26 * figures 1-18 *;
 [X]DE20203551U  (BLUM GMBH) [X] 1-26 * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]DE202009005203U  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1-26 * figures 1-22 *