Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3267846

EP3267846 - FURNITURE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/03]FURNITURE DRIVE, HOUSING FOR COMPONENTS OF A FURNITURE DRIVE, AND ASSEMBLY METHOD FOR A HOUSING OF THIS TYPE
[2019/02]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2019/24]
Former [2018/03]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KLIMM, Hartmut
Schwartemeierstraße 24
32257 Bünde / DE
02 / DÜCK, Heinrich
Weißdornstraße 65
32339 Espelkamp / DE
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date16710418.111.03.2016
[2018/03]
WO2016EP55370
Priority number, dateDE201520101319U13.03.2015         Original published format: DE 202015101319 U
[2018/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016146550
Date:22.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3267846
Date:17.01.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016
[2018/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3267846
Date:12.06.2019
Language:DE
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04, B29C65/60, B29C65/00
[2018/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MÖBELANTRIEB[2019/02]
English:FURNITURE DRIVE[2019/02]
French:ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR MEUBLE[2019/02]
Former [2018/03]MÖBELANTRIEB, GEHÄUSE FÜR KOMPONENTEN EINES MÖBELANTRIEBS UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN FÜR DERARTIGES GEHÄUSE
Former [2018/03]FURNITURE DRIVE, HOUSING FOR COMPONENTS OF A FURNITURE DRIVE, AND ASSEMBLY METHOD FOR A HOUSING OF THIS TYPE
Former [2018/03]ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR MEUBLE, BOÎTIER DESTINÉ À DES COMPOSANTS D'UN ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR MEUBLE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN BOÎTIER DE CE TYPE
Entry into regional phase12.10.2017National basic fee paid 
12.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/03]
12.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2019Fee for grant paid
30.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]GB2210352  (SKC LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3-7 * abstract * * page 3, lines 9-15,23-25 * * page 4, lines 9-12 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 2,8,9;
 [Y]DE202012104376U  (DEWERTOKIN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10-12 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 19,22 *;
 [A]FR1587657  (ZAFIRA) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JP2005267818  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *