Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3289618

EP3289618 - LED MODULE FOR EMITTING WHITE LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic Jennersdorf GmbH
Technologiepark 10
8380 Jennersdorf / AT
For all designated states
Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
[2018/10]
Inventor(s)01 / PACHLER, Peter
Otto Loewigasse 4/4/19
8042 Graz / AT
02 / BORSOI, Giulio
Am Kehlerpark 12
6850 Dornbirn / AT
 [2018/10]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2018/10]
Application number, filing date16711996.511.03.2016
[2018/10]
WO2016EP55342
Priority number, dateDE20151020793429.04.2015         Original published format: DE102015207934
[2018/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016173761
Date:03.11.2016
Language:DE
[2016/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3289618
Date:07.03.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/50, H01L25/075, F21K99/00
[2018/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/10]
TitleGerman:LED-MODUL ZUR ABGABE VON WEISSLICHT[2018/10]
English:LED MODULE FOR EMITTING WHITE LIGHT[2018/10]
French:MODULE DE LED POUR ÉMISSION DE LUMIÈRE BLANCHE[2018/10]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2017National basic fee paid 
25.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/10]
25.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2717338  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-12,14-22,25,26 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0105]; figures 8-9 * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0182]; figures 24-25 * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0216]; figures 32-36 * [I] 2,4,23,24;
 [X]JP2014049504  (SHARP KK) [X] 1,3,5-22,25,26 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1(a)-1(c), 2(a)-2(b) * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0065]; figures 5(a)-5(d) * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0090]; figures 6(a)-6(f) *;
 [A]US2013069527  (UNDERWOOD ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 23 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054]; figure 5 *;
 [A]JP2008218485  (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1,26 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-4 *;
 [XP]WO2015110875  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [XP] 1,3,5-9,11,14,16-20,25,26 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 28; figures 1A-1B * * page 7, line 9 - line 27; figure 4 *