Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3251461

EP3251461 - RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE AND BROADCAST PRIORITIZATION FOR MACHINE TYPE COMMUNICATIONS (MTC) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/49]
Inventor(s)01 / VAJAPEYAM, Madhavan Srinivasan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / XU, Hao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / GAAL, Peter
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / CHEN, Wanshi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / RICO ALVARINO, Alberto
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / FAKOORIAN, Seyed Ali Akbar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/49]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/49]
Application number, filing date16712550.929.01.2016
[2017/49]
WO2016US15523
Priority number, dateUS201562110164P30.01.2015         Original published format: US 201562110164 P
US201562165823P22.05.2015         Original published format: US 201562165823 P
US20161500980428.01.2016         Original published format: US201615009804
[2017/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016123429
Date:04.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3251461
Date:06.12.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016
[2017/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, H04W4/00
[2017/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/49]
TitleGerman:DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND RUNDFUNKPRIORISIERUNG FÜR MASCHINENKOMMUNIKATION[2017/49]
English:RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE AND BROADCAST PRIORITIZATION FOR MACHINE TYPE COMMUNICATIONS (MTC)[2017/49]
French:PROCÉDURE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE ET PRIORISATION DE DIFFUSION POUR DES COMMUNICATIONS DE TYPE MACHINE (MTC)[2017/49]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2017National basic fee paid 
20.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/49]
20.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014313999  (XU HAO [US], et al) [X] 1,9-11,19,27-29,37-39,55,71-74,81-84,91-94,101-104,111,112 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0065]; figures 6,7 * [I] 2-8,12-18,20-26,30-36,40-54,56-70,75-80,85-90,95-100,105-110;
 [XAI]US2013083749  (XU HAO [US], et al) [X] 73,74,81-84,91-94,101-104,111,112 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0078] * [A] 1-72 [I] 75-80,85-90,95-100,105-110;
 [XAI]US2015016312  (LI YING [US], et al) [X] 73,81,83,91,93,101,103,111 * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0191] * * paragraph [0214] * * paragraph [0226] - paragraph [0260] * [A] 1-72 [I] 74-80,82,84-90,92,94-100,102,104-110,112;
 [A]US2013083753  (LEE MOON-IL [US], et al) [A] 1-112 * paragraphs [0250] , [0251] *
 [XI]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "RACH Channel Design for MTC Coverage Enhancements", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-140447 RACH CHANNEL DESIGN FOR MTC COVERAGE ENHANCEMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20140209), XP050735983 [X] 1,19,37-39,55,71,72 * the whole document * [I] 2-18,20-36,40-54,56-70
 [A]  - CATT, "PRACH coverage enhancement", vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20141117 - 20141121, (20141117), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-144623, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20141117), XP050875710 [A] 1-112 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "PSS/SSS, PBCH and PRACH operation under power consumption reduction", vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20141117 - 20141121, (20141117), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-144699 - REL-13 MTC - PSS, SSS, PBCH & PRACH V02, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20141117), XP050875782 [A] 1-112 * the whole document *